Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Sen. Grassley, Chuck [R-IA]* 02/13/2009
Sen. Durbin, Richard [D-IL]* 02/13/2009
Sen. Schumer, Charles E. [D-NY]* 02/13/2009
Sen. Feingold, Russell D. [D-WI]* 02/13/2009
Sen. Cornyn, John [R-TX]* 02/13/2009
Sen. Klobuchar, Amy [D-MN] 07/29/2009
Sen. Kaufman, Edward E. [D-DE] 07/30/2009
Sen. Kerry, John F. [D-MA] 09/27/2010
Sen. Begich, Mark [D-AK] 11/17/2010
Sen. Tester, Jon [D-MT] 11/17/2010