Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Sen. Schumer, Charles E. [D-NY]* 02/13/2009
Sen. Lugar, Richard G. [R-IN]* 02/13/2009
Sen. Graham, Lindsey [R-SC]* 02/13/2009
Sen. Gillibrand, Kirsten E. [D-NY] 03/23/2009
Sen. McCaskill, Claire [D-MO] 03/23/2009
Sen. Murray, Patty [D-WA] 03/30/2009
Sen. Klobuchar, Amy [D-MN] 03/30/2009
Sen. Hagan, Kay [D-NC] 05/18/2009
Sen. Kaufman, Edward E. [D-DE] 11/05/2009
Sen. Udall, Tom [D-NM] 11/18/2009
Sen. Leahy, Patrick J. [D-VT] 12/14/2009
Sen. Landrieu, Mary L. [D-LA] 02/04/2010
Sen. Isakson, Johnny [R-GA] 03/04/2010
Sen. Sanders, Bernard [I-VT] 03/09/2010
Sen. Dodd, Christopher J. [D-CT] 03/22/2010