Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Sen. Mikulski, Barbara A. [D-MD]* 02/23/2009
Sen. Hutchison, Kay Bailey [R-TX]* 02/23/2009
Sen. Stabenow, Debbie [D-MI]* 02/23/2009
Sen. Lincoln, Blanche L. [D-AR]* 02/23/2009
Sen. Landrieu, Mary L. [D-LA]* 02/23/2009
Sen. Boxer, Barbara [D-CA]* 02/23/2009
Sen. Corker, Bob [R-TN]* 02/23/2009
Sen. Bunning, Jim [R-KY] 03/17/2009
Sen. Burr, Richard [R-NC] 03/23/2009
Sen. Cardin, Benjamin L. [D-MD] 04/20/2009
Sen. Brown, Sherrod [D-OH] 04/20/2009
Sen. Kaufman, Edward E. [D-DE] 04/20/2009
Sen. Menendez, Robert [D-NJ] 05/12/2009
Sen. Kennedy, Edward M. [D-MA] 05/20/2009
Sen. Hagan, Kay [D-NC] 05/21/2009
Sen. Nelson, Ben [D-NE] 06/02/2009
Sen. Murkowski, Lisa [R-AK] 06/02/2009
Sen. Brownback, Sam [R-KS] 06/02/2009
Sen. Risch, James E. [R-ID] 06/02/2009
Sen. Snowe, Olympia J. [R-ME] 06/02/2009
Sen. Johnson, Tim [D-SD] 06/03/2009
Sen. Cochran, Thad [R-MS] 06/03/2009
Sen. Ensign, John [R-NV] 06/03/2009
Sen. Begich, Mark [D-AK] 06/03/2009
Sen. Gillibrand, Kirsten E. [D-NY] 06/08/2009
Sen. Grassley, Chuck [R-IA] 06/08/2009
Sen. Vitter, David [R-LA] 06/08/2009
Sen. Bennett, Robert F. [R-UT] 06/11/2009
Sen. Wicker, Roger F. [R-MS] 06/18/2009
Sen. Enzi, Michael B. [R-WY] 06/18/2009
Sen. Graham, Lindsey [R-SC] 06/24/2009
Sen. Roberts, Pat [R-KS] 06/25/2009
Sen. Chambliss, Saxby [R-GA] 07/06/2009
Sen. Crapo, Mike [R-ID] 07/06/2009
Sen. Barrasso, John [R-WY] 07/07/2009
Sen. Casey, Robert P., Jr. [D-PA] 07/08/2009
Sen. Webb, Jim [D-VA] 07/28/2009
Sen. Alexander, Lamar [R-TN] 08/04/2009
Sen. Franken, Al [D-MN] 08/05/2009
Sen. Isakson, Johnny [R-GA] 08/05/2009
Sen. Bingaman, Jeff [D-NM] 08/06/2009
Sen. Carper, Thomas R. [D-DE] 08/06/2009
Sen. Shaheen, Jeanne [D-NH] 08/06/2009
Sen. Schumer, Charles E. [D-NY] 09/08/2009
Sen. Bond, Christopher S. [R-MO] 09/08/2009
Sen. Sanders, Bernard [I-VT] 09/08/2009
Sen. Tester, Jon [D-MT] 09/08/2009
Sen. Whitehouse, Sheldon [D-RI] 09/10/2009
Sen. Coburn, Tom [R-OK] 09/10/2009
Sen. Feinstein, Dianne [D-CA] 09/14/2009
Sen. Dorgan, Byron L. [D-ND] 09/15/2009
Sen. Murray, Patty [D-WA] 09/16/2009
Sen. Gregg, Judd [R-NH] 09/16/2009
Sen. Klobuchar, Amy [D-MN] 09/16/2009
Sen. Udall, Tom [D-NM] 09/16/2009
Sen. Inhofe, James M. [R-OK] 09/22/2009
Sen. Akaka, Daniel K. [D-HI] 09/23/2009
Sen. Inouye, Daniel K. [D-HI] 09/23/2009
Sen. Durbin, Richard [D-IL] 09/25/2009
Sen. Lieberman, Joseph I. [ID-CT] 09/25/2009
Sen. Harkin, Tom [D-IA] 09/25/2009
Sen. Lautenberg, Frank R. [D-NJ] 09/25/2009
Sen. Burris, Roland [D-IL] 09/25/2009
Sen. McCaskill, Claire [D-MO] 09/25/2009
Sen. Lugar, Richard G. [R-IN] 09/29/2009
Sen. Reed, Jack [D-RI] 09/29/2009
Sen. Cornyn, John [R-TX] 09/29/2009
Sen. Hatch, Orrin G. [R-UT] 09/29/2009
Sen. Merkley, Jeff [D-OR] 10/06/2009
Sen. Pryor, Mark L. [D-AR] 10/06/2009
Sen. Conrad, Kent [D-ND] 10/14/2009
Sen. Kerry, John F. [D-MA] 10/14/2009
Sen. Warner, Mark R. [D-VA] 10/14/2009
Sen. Sessions, Jeff [R-AL] 10/15/2009