Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Sen. McCain, John [R-AZ]* 02/23/2009
Sen. Carper, Thomas R. [D-DE] 02/26/2009
Sen. Nelson, Bill [D-FL] 02/26/2009
Sen. Kaufman, Edward E. [D-DE] 03/23/2009
Sen. Nelson, Ben [D-NE] 04/02/2009
Sen. Udall, Mark [D-CO] 04/02/2009
Sen. Martinez, Mel [R-FL] 04/20/2009
Sen. Collins, Susan M. [R-ME] 04/27/2009
Sen. Harkin, Tom [D-IA] 05/05/2009
Sen. Rockefeller, John D., IV [D-WV] 05/05/2009
Sen. Pryor, Mark L. [D-AR] 05/06/2009
Sen. Inhofe, James M. [R-OK] 05/06/2009
Sen. Lieberman, Joseph I. [ID-CT] 05/06/2009
Sen. Begich, Mark [D-AK] 05/07/2009