Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Sen. Brownback, Sam [R-KS]* 02/23/2009
Sen. Isakson, Johnny [R-GA] 03/30/2009
Sen. Chambliss, Saxby [R-GA] 04/20/2009
Sen. Bond, Christopher S. [R-MO] 04/24/2009
Sen. McCaskill, Claire [D-MO] 06/01/2009
Sen. Burris, Roland [D-IL] 06/08/2009
Sen. Bennett, Robert F. [R-UT] 06/11/2009
Sen. Begich, Mark [D-AK] 07/06/2009
Sen. Cardin, Benjamin L. [D-MD] 07/06/2009
Sen. Wyden, Ron [D-OR] 07/09/2009
Sen. Risch, James E. [R-ID] 07/15/2009
Sen. Snowe, Olympia J. [R-ME] 07/27/2009
Sen. Lincoln, Blanche L. [D-AR] 07/29/2009
Sen. Johnson, Tim [D-SD] 08/03/2009
Sen. Murkowski, Lisa [R-AK] 08/04/2009
Sen. Hagan, Kay [D-NC] 10/14/2009
Sen. Lieberman, Joseph I. [ID-CT] 11/19/2009
Sen. Ensign, John [R-NV] 12/07/2009
Sen. Cochran, Thad [R-MS] 12/09/2009
Sen. Menendez, Robert [D-NJ] 12/14/2009
Sen. Voinovich, George V. [R-OH] 12/14/2009
Sen. Hutchison, Kay Bailey [R-TX] 04/21/2010
Sen. Harkin, Tom [D-IA] 05/24/2010
Sen. Sessions, Jeff [R-AL] 05/27/2010
Sen. Inhofe, James M. [R-OK] 09/22/2010
Sen. Gregg, Judd [R-NH] 09/22/2010
Sen. DeMint, Jim [R-SC] 09/23/2010
Sen. Johanns, Mike [R-NE] 09/23/2010
Sen. Thune, John [R-SD] 09/23/2010
Sen. Barrasso, John [R-WY] 09/23/2010
Sen. Lugar, Richard G. [R-IN] 09/23/2010
Sen. Graham, Lindsey [R-SC] 09/23/2010
Sen. Baucus, Max [D-MT] 09/23/2010
Sen. Bennet, Michael F. [D-CO] 09/23/2010
Sen. Carper, Thomas R. [D-DE] 09/23/2010
Sen. Dorgan, Byron L. [D-ND] 09/23/2010
Sen. Franken, Al [D-MN] 09/23/2010
Sen. Gillibrand, Kirsten E. [D-NY] 09/23/2010
Sen. Dodd, Christopher J. [D-CT] 09/23/2010
Sen. Shelby, Richard C. [R-AL] 09/23/2010
Sen. Conrad, Kent [D-ND] 09/23/2010
Sen. Burr, Richard [R-NC] 09/23/2010
Sen. Kerry, John F. [D-MA] 09/23/2010
Sen. Rockefeller, John D., IV [D-WV] 09/23/2010
Sen. Feinstein, Dianne [D-CA] 09/23/2010
Sen. Hatch, Orrin G. [R-UT] 09/23/2010
Sen. Brown, Scott P. [R-MA] 09/27/2010
Sen. Inouye, Daniel K. [D-HI] 09/27/2010
Sen. Landrieu, Mary L. [D-LA] 09/27/2010
Sen. Cornyn, John [R-TX] 09/27/2010
Sen. Crapo, Mike [R-ID] 09/27/2010
Sen. LeMieux, George S. [R-FL] 09/27/2010
Sen. Stabenow, Debbie [D-MI] 09/27/2010
Sen. Alexander, Lamar [R-TN] 09/27/2010
Sen. Grassley, Chuck [R-IA] 09/27/2010
Sen. Leahy, Patrick J. [D-VT] 09/27/2010
Sen. Coburn, Tom [R-OK] 09/27/2010
Sen. Akaka, Daniel K. [D-HI] 09/27/2010
Sen. Warner, Mark R. [D-VA] 09/27/2010
Sen. Wicker, Roger F. [R-MS] 09/27/2010
Sen. Specter, Arlen [D-PA] 09/27/2010
Sen. Lautenberg, Frank R. [D-NJ] 09/27/2010
Sen. Levin, Carl [D-MI] 09/27/2010
Sen. Udall, Mark [D-CO] 09/27/2010
Sen. Klobuchar, Amy [D-MN] 09/27/2010
Sen. Brown, Sherrod [D-OH] 09/27/2010
Sen. Schumer, Charles E. [D-NY] 09/27/2010
Sen. Boxer, Barbara [D-CA] 09/27/2010
Sen. Corker, Bob [R-TN] 09/28/2010
Sen. Bunning, Jim [R-KY] 09/28/2010
Sen. Kohl, Herb [D-WI] 09/28/2010
Sen. Shaheen, Jeanne [D-NH] 09/28/2010
Sen. Enzi, Michael B. [R-WY] 09/28/2010