There is 1 version of this bill. View text

Click the check-box to add or remove the section, click the text link to scroll to that section.
Titles Actions Overview All Actions Cosponsors Committees Related Bills Subjects Latest Summary All Summaries

Titles (1)

Official Titles

Official Titles - Senate

Official Titles as Introduced

A bill to amend the Internal Revenue Code of 1986 to extend and modify the railroad track maintenance credit.


Actions Overview (1)

Date
02/24/2009Introduced in Senate

All Actions (1)

Date
02/24/2009Read twice and referred to the Committee on Finance.
Action By: Senate

Cosponsors (53)

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Sen. Crapo, Mike [R-ID]* 02/24/2009
Sen. Murray, Patty [D-WA] 03/17/2009
Sen. Brownback, Sam [R-KS] 03/19/2009
Sen. Kerry, John F. [D-MA] 03/24/2009
Sen. Bayh, Evan [D-IN] 03/24/2009
Sen. Roberts, Pat [R-KS] 03/24/2009
Sen. Risch, James E. [R-ID] 04/01/2009
Sen. Tester, Jon [D-MT] 04/01/2009
Sen. Pryor, Mark L. [D-AR] 04/27/2009
Sen. Wicker, Roger F. [R-MS] 04/27/2009
Sen. Wyden, Ron [D-OR] 04/27/2009
Sen. Murkowski, Lisa [R-AK] 05/12/2009
Sen. Conrad, Kent [D-ND] 06/01/2009
Sen. Isakson, Johnny [R-GA] 06/01/2009
Sen. Bond, Christopher S. [R-MO] 06/01/2009
Sen. Leahy, Patrick J. [D-VT] 06/01/2009
Sen. Harkin, Tom [D-IA] 06/03/2009
Sen. Boxer, Barbara [D-CA] 06/03/2009
Sen. Nelson, Bill [D-FL] 06/11/2009
Sen. Bunning, Jim [R-KY] 06/11/2009
Sen. Sanders, Bernard [I-VT] 06/11/2009
Sen. Snowe, Olympia J. [R-ME] 06/11/2009
Sen. Thune, John [R-SD] 06/23/2009
Sen. Collins, Susan M. [R-ME] 06/25/2009
Sen. Stabenow, Debbie [D-MI] 06/25/2009
Sen. Gillibrand, Kirsten E. [D-NY] 06/25/2009
Sen. Bennett, Robert F. [R-UT] 06/25/2009
Sen. Johnson, Tim [D-SD] 07/06/2009
Sen. Graham, Lindsey [R-SC] 07/06/2009
Sen. Cantwell, Maria [D-WA] 07/07/2009
Sen. Cochran, Thad [R-MS] 07/08/2009
Sen. Casey, Robert P., Jr. [D-PA] 07/09/2009
Sen. Coburn, Tom [R-OK] 07/16/2009
Sen. Levin, Carl [D-MI] 07/16/2009
Sen. Hatch, Orrin G. [R-UT] 07/27/2009
Sen. Lieberman, Joseph I. [ID-CT] 07/28/2009
Sen. Specter, Arlen [D-PA] 08/04/2009
Sen. Burr, Richard [R-NC] 08/05/2009
Sen. Begich, Mark [D-AK] 09/08/2009
Sen. Mikulski, Barbara A. [D-MD] 09/14/2009
Sen. Inhofe, James M. [R-OK] 09/16/2009
Sen. Chambliss, Saxby [R-GA] 09/17/2009
Sen. Burris, Roland [D-IL] 09/29/2009
Sen. Alexander, Lamar [R-TN] 10/14/2009
Sen. Ensign, John [R-NV] 10/14/2009
Sen. Sessions, Jeff [R-AL] 10/15/2009
Sen. Udall, Tom [D-NM] 10/27/2009
Sen. Lugar, Richard G. [R-IN] 11/02/2009
Sen. Webb, Jim [D-VA] 11/09/2009
Sen. Shaheen, Jeanne [D-NH] 11/30/2009
Sen. Dodd, Christopher J. [D-CT] 11/30/2009
Sen. Merkley, Jeff [D-OR] 12/07/2009
Sen. Nelson, Ben [D-NE] 03/05/2010

Committees (1)

Committees, subcommittees and links to reports associated with this bill are listed here, as well as the nature and date of committee activity and Congressional report number.

Committee / Subcommittee Date Activity Reports
Senate Finance02/24/2009 Referred to

A related bill may be a companion measure, an identical bill, a procedurally-related measure, or one with text similarities. Bill relationships are identified by the House, the Senate, or CRS, and refer only to same-congress measures.


Subjects (3)


Latest Summary (1)

There is one summary for S.461. View summaries

Shown Here:
Introduced in Senate (02/24/2009)

Amends the Internal Revenue Code to: (1) increase the allowable amount of the railroad track maintenance tax credit; (2) revise the types of expenditures eligible for such credit; and (3) extend such credit through 2012.