Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Sen. Vitter, David [R-LA]* 02/24/2009
Sen. Lieberman, Joseph I. [ID-CT] 02/26/2009
Sen. Menendez, Robert [D-NJ] 03/09/2009
Sen. Ensign, John [R-NV] 03/16/2009
Sen. Burr, Richard [R-NC] 03/17/2009
Sen. Whitehouse, Sheldon [D-RI] 03/18/2009
Sen. Burris, Roland [D-IL] 04/21/2009
Sen. Sanders, Bernard [I-VT] 10/22/2009