Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Sen. Kohl, Herb [D-WI]* 02/25/2009
Sen. Akaka, Daniel K. [D-HI] 03/16/2009
Sen. Collins, Susan M. [R-ME] 03/30/2009
Sen. Burris, Roland [D-IL] 04/02/2009
Sen. Durbin, Richard [D-IL] 07/14/2009