Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Sen. Wicker, Roger F. [R-MS]* 02/25/2009
Sen. Akaka, Daniel K. [D-HI]* 02/25/2009
Sen. Baucus, Max [D-MT]* 02/25/2009
Sen. Bingaman, Jeff [D-NM]* 02/25/2009
Sen. Bond, Christopher S. [R-MO]* 02/25/2009
Sen. Cardin, Benjamin L. [D-MD]* 02/25/2009
Sen. Cochran, Thad [R-MS]* 02/25/2009
Sen. Kennedy, Edward M. [D-MA]* 02/25/2009
Sen. Lieberman, Joseph I. [ID-CT]* 02/25/2009
Sen. Lincoln, Blanche L. [D-AR]* 02/25/2009
Sen. Murray, Patty [D-WA]* 02/25/2009
Sen. Reed, Jack [D-RI]* 02/25/2009
Sen. Roberts, Pat [R-KS]* 02/25/2009
Sen. Sanders, Bernard [I-VT]* 02/25/2009
Sen. Schumer, Charles E. [D-NY]* 02/25/2009
Sen. Whitehouse, Sheldon [D-RI]* 02/25/2009
Sen. Levin, Carl [D-MI]* 02/25/2009
Sen. Reid, Harry [D-NV]* 02/25/2009
Sen. Stabenow, Debbie [D-MI]* 02/25/2009
Sen. Pryor, Mark L. [D-AR] 02/26/2009
Sen. Brown, Sherrod [D-OH] 02/26/2009
Sen. Voinovich, George V. [R-OH] 03/02/2009
Sen. Casey, Robert P., Jr. [D-PA] 03/02/2009
Sen. Dodd, Christopher J. [D-CT] 03/02/2009
Sen. Lautenberg, Frank R. [D-NJ] 03/04/2009
Sen. Menendez, Robert [D-NJ] 03/12/2009
Sen. Klobuchar, Amy [D-MN] 03/24/2009
Sen. Boxer, Barbara [D-CA] 03/30/2009
Sen. Burris, Roland [D-IL] 03/30/2009
Sen. Bennet, Michael F. [D-CO] 04/30/2009
Sen. Gillibrand, Kirsten E. [D-NY] 05/11/2009
Sen. Kaufman, Edward E. [D-DE] 06/18/2009
Sen. Graham, Lindsey [R-SC] 10/06/2009