Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Sen. Feinstein, Dianne [D-CA]* 02/25/2009
Sen. Johanns, Mike [R-NE] 03/03/2009
Sen. Isakson, Johnny [R-GA] 03/09/2009
Sen. Specter, Arlen [R-PA] 03/09/2009
Sen. Landrieu, Mary L. [D-LA] 03/10/2009
Sen. Chambliss, Saxby [R-GA] 03/12/2009
Sen. Martinez, Mel [R-FL] 03/12/2009
Sen. Sessions, Jeff [R-AL] 03/16/2009
Sen. Cardin, Benjamin L. [D-MD] 03/18/2009
Sen. Byrd, Robert C. [D-WV] 03/18/2009
Sen. Tester, Jon [D-MT] 03/19/2009
Sen. Wyden, Ron [D-OR] 03/19/2009
Sen. Burris, Roland [D-IL] 03/25/2009
Sen. Bayh, Evan [D-IN] 03/30/2009
Sen. Brown, Sherrod [D-OH] 03/30/2009
Sen. Begich, Mark [D-AK] 03/30/2009
Sen. Wicker, Roger F. [R-MS] 04/02/2009
Sen. Durbin, Richard [D-IL] 04/02/2009
Sen. Risch, James E. [R-ID] 04/20/2009
Sen. Bond, Christopher S. [R-MO] 04/20/2009
Sen. Coburn, Tom [R-OK] 04/22/2009
Sen. Hatch, Orrin G. [R-UT] 04/27/2009
Sen. Snowe, Olympia J. [R-ME] 04/27/2009
Sen. Murkowski, Lisa [R-AK] 04/28/2009
Sen. Cochran, Thad [R-MS] 04/30/2009
Sen. Hutchison, Kay Bailey [R-TX] 05/04/2009
Sen. Ensign, John [R-NV] 05/04/2009
Sen. Lincoln, Blanche L. [D-AR] 05/04/2009
Sen. Brownback, Sam [R-KS] 05/06/2009
Sen. Bunning, Jim [R-KY] 05/06/2009
Sen. Inhofe, James M. [R-OK] 05/06/2009
Sen. Cantwell, Maria [D-WA] 05/11/2009
Sen. Gregg, Judd [R-NH] 05/11/2009
Sen. Udall, Mark [D-CO] 05/11/2009
Sen. Thune, John [R-SD] 05/11/2009
Sen. Vitter, David [R-LA] 05/18/2009
Sen. Lieberman, Joseph I. [ID-CT] 06/25/2009
Sen. Johnson, Tim [D-SD] 06/25/2009
Sen. DeMint, Jim [R-SC] 07/08/2009
Sen. Barrasso, John [R-WY] 07/10/2009
Sen. Cornyn, John [R-TX] 07/10/2009
Sen. Shelby, Richard C. [R-AL] 07/10/2009
Sen. Enzi, Michael B. [R-WY] 07/15/2009
Sen. Shaheen, Jeanne [D-NH] 07/16/2009