Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Sen. Cochran, Thad [R-MS]* 02/25/2009
Sen. Schumer, Charles E. [D-NY]* 02/25/2009
Sen. Bennett, Robert F. [R-UT]* 02/25/2009
Sen. Feinstein, Dianne [D-CA]* 02/25/2009
Sen. McCain, John [R-AZ]* 02/25/2009
Sen. Durbin, Richard [D-IL]* 02/25/2009
Sen. Alexander, Lamar [R-TN]* 02/25/2009
Sen. Reid, Harry [D-NV]* 02/25/2009
Sen. Lugar, Richard G. [R-IN]* 02/25/2009
Sen. Lieberman, Joseph I. [ID-CT]* 02/25/2009
Sen. Isakson, Johnny [R-GA]* 02/25/2009
Sen. Dodd, Christopher J. [D-CT]* 02/25/2009
Sen. Grassley, Chuck [R-IA]* 02/25/2009
Sen. Leahy, Patrick J. [D-VT]* 02/25/2009
Sen. Levin, Carl [D-MI]* 02/25/2009
Sen. Kerry, John F. [D-MA]* 02/25/2009
Sen. Akaka, Daniel K. [D-HI]* 02/25/2009
Sen. Harkin, Tom [D-IA]* 02/25/2009
Sen. Nelson, Ben [D-NE]* 02/25/2009
Sen. Reed, Jack [D-RI]* 02/25/2009
Sen. Rockefeller, John D., IV [D-WV]* 02/25/2009
Sen. Bingaman, Jeff [D-NM]* 02/25/2009
Sen. Brown, Sherrod [D-OH]* 02/25/2009
Sen. Cardin, Benjamin L. [D-MD]* 02/25/2009
Sen. Chambliss, Saxby [R-GA] 02/26/2009
Sen. Graham, Lindsey [R-SC] 03/04/2009
Sen. Byrd, Robert C. [D-WV] 03/05/2009
Sen. Tester, Jon [D-MT] 03/09/2009
Sen. Boxer, Barbara [D-CA] 03/12/2009
Sen. Begich, Mark [D-AK] 03/16/2009
Sen. Cornyn, John [R-TX] 03/16/2009
Sen. Hagan, Kay [D-NC] 03/24/2009
Sen. Wyden, Ron [D-OR] 03/26/2009
Sen. Snowe, Olympia J. [R-ME] 04/20/2009
Sen. McCaskill, Claire [D-MO] 04/22/2009
Sen. Merkley, Jeff [D-OR] 04/23/2009
Sen. Klobuchar, Amy [D-MN] 04/27/2009
Sen. Collins, Susan M. [R-ME] 06/02/2009
Sen. Shaheen, Jeanne [D-NH] 06/16/2009
Sen. Gillibrand, Kirsten E. [D-NY] 06/23/2009
Sen. Udall, Mark [D-CO] 07/27/2009