Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Sen. Specter, Arlen [R-PA]* 02/26/2009
Sen. Kennedy, Edward M. [D-MA]* 02/26/2009
Sen. Hatch, Orrin G. [R-UT]* 02/26/2009
Sen. Feinstein, Dianne [D-CA]* 02/26/2009
Sen. Reid, Harry [D-NV]* 02/26/2009
Sen. Shaheen, Jeanne [D-NH] 03/03/2009
Sen. Dodd, Christopher J. [D-CT] 03/09/2009
Sen. Kerry, John F. [D-MA] 03/09/2009
Sen. Stabenow, Debbie [D-MI] 03/19/2009
Sen. Boxer, Barbara [D-CA] 04/27/2009