There are 5 versions of this bill. View text

Click the check-box to add or remove the section, click the text link to scroll to that section.
Titles Actions Overview All Actions Cosponsors Committees Related Bills Subjects Latest Summary All Summaries

Titles (1)

Official Titles

Official Titles - Senate

Official Titles as Introduced

A bill to authorize a major medical facility project at the Department of Veterans Affairs Medical Center, Walla Walla, Washington, and for other purposes.


Actions Overview (7)

Date
11/11/2009Became Public Law No: 111-98. (TXT | PDF)
11/11/2009Signed by President.
11/04/2009Presented to President.
11/02/2009Passed/agreed to in House: On motion to suspend the rules and pass the bill Agreed to by the Yeas and Nays: (2/3 required): 352 - 0 (Roll no. 834).(text: CR H12165)
07/15/2009Passed/agreed to in Senate: Passed Senate without amendment by Unanimous Consent.(text: CR S7573)
07/15/2009Senate Committee on Veterans' Affairs discharged by Unanimous Consent.(consideration: CR S7573)
03/02/2009Introduced in Senate

All Actions (16)

Date Chamber
11/11/2009Became Public Law No: 111-98. (TXT | PDF)
11/11/2009Signed by President.
11/04/2009SenatePresented to President.
11/02/2009-7:14pmHouseMotion to reconsider laid on the table Agreed to without objection.
11/02/2009-7:14pmHouseOn motion to suspend the rules and pass the bill Agreed to by the Yeas and Nays: (2/3 required): 352 - 0 (Roll no. 834). (text: CR H12165)
11/02/2009-7:08pmHouseConsidered as unfinished business. (consideration: CR H12179)
11/02/2009-3:55pmHouseAt the conclusion of debate, the Yeas and Nays were demanded and ordered. Pursuant to the provisions of clause 8, rule XX, the Chair announced that further proceedings on the motion would be postponed.
11/02/2009-3:47pmHouseDEBATE - The House proceeded with forty minutes of debate on S. 509.
11/02/2009-3:47pmHouseConsidered under suspension of the rules. (consideration: CR H12165-12167)
11/02/2009-3:47pmHouseMr. Walz moved to suspend the rules and pass the bill.
07/16/2009HouseReferred to the House Committee on Veterans' Affairs.
07/16/2009SenateMessage on Senate action sent to the House.
07/16/2009-10:07amHouseReceived in the House.
07/15/2009SenatePassed Senate without amendment by Unanimous Consent. (text: CR S7573)
07/15/2009SenateSenate Committee on Veterans' Affairs discharged by Unanimous Consent. (consideration: CR S7573)
03/02/2009SenateRead twice and referred to the Committee on Veterans' Affairs.

Cosponsors (0)

No cosponsors.


Committees (2)

Committees, subcommittees and links to reports associated with this bill are listed here, as well as the nature and date of committee activity and Congressional report number.

Committee / Subcommittee Date Activity Reports
Senate Veterans' Affairs03/02/2009 Referred to
07/15/2009 Discharged from
House Veterans' Affairs07/16/2009 Referred to

No related bill information was received for S.509.


Subjects (4)


Latest Summary (4)

There are 4 summaries for S.509. View summaries

Shown Here:
Public Law No: 111-98 (11/11/2009)

(This measure has not been amended since it was introduced. The summary has been expanded because action occurred on the measure.)

Authorizes the Secretary of Veterans Affairs (VA) to carry out a major medical facility project at the Department of Veterans Affairs Medical Center, Walla Walla, Washington.

Authorizes appropriations.