Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Sen. Gregg, Judd [R-NH]* 03/03/2009
Sen. Kennedy, Edward M. [D-MA]* 03/03/2009
Sen. Burr, Richard [R-NC]* 03/03/2009
Sen. Dodd, Christopher J. [D-CT]* 03/03/2009
Sen. Alexander, Lamar [R-TN]* 03/03/2009
Sen. Isakson, Johnny [R-GA]* 03/03/2009
Sen. Klobuchar, Amy [D-MN] 03/04/2009
Sen. Chambliss, Saxby [R-GA] 03/04/2009
Sen. Burris, Roland [D-IL] 06/24/2009
Sen. Udall, Tom [D-NM] 07/28/2009
Sen. Gillibrand, Kirsten E. [D-NY] 10/14/2009
Sen. Hatch, Orrin G. [R-UT] 11/09/2009
Sen. Bingaman, Jeff [D-NM] 11/18/2009
Sen. Harkin, Tom [D-IA] 11/30/2009
Sen. Enzi, Michael B. [R-WY] 11/30/2009
Sen. Vitter, David [R-LA] 05/27/2010
Sen. Nelson, Ben [D-NE] 06/16/2010
Sen. Kaufman, Edward E. [D-DE] 09/13/2010
Sen. Menendez, Robert [D-NJ] 09/13/2010
Sen. Casey, Robert P., Jr. [D-PA] 09/21/2010
Sen. Franken, Al [D-MN] 11/29/2010