Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Sen. Tester, Jon [D-MT]* 03/03/2009
Sen. Roberts, Pat [R-KS] 03/18/2009
Sen. Thune, John [R-SD] 03/25/2009
Sen. Corker, Bob [R-TN] 03/26/2009
Sen. Isakson, Johnny [R-GA] 03/30/2009
Sen. Brown, Sherrod [D-OH] 03/31/2009
Sen. Alexander, Lamar [R-TN] 04/01/2009
Sen. Chambliss, Saxby [R-GA] 04/20/2009
Sen. Harkin, Tom [D-IA] 05/14/2009
Sen. Kennedy, Edward M. [D-MA] 05/18/2009
Sen. Johanns, Mike [R-NE] 06/01/2009
Sen. Johnson, Tim [D-SD] 06/15/2009
Sen. Lautenberg, Frank R. [D-NJ] 07/07/2009
Sen. Feingold, Russell D. [D-WI] 07/23/2009
Sen. Begich, Mark [D-AK] 09/15/2009