Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Sen. Hatch, Orrin G. [R-UT]* 03/03/2009
Sen. Schumer, Charles E. [D-NY]* 03/03/2009
Sen. Crapo, Mike [R-ID]* 03/03/2009
Sen. Whitehouse, Sheldon [D-RI]* 03/03/2009
Sen. Risch, James E. [R-ID]* 03/03/2009
Sen. Gillibrand, Kirsten E. [D-NY]* 03/03/2009
Sen. Klobuchar, Amy [D-MN] 04/02/2009
Sen. Specter, Arlen [R-PA] 04/02/2009
Sen. Cornyn, John [R-TX] 04/02/2009
Sen. Feinstein, Dianne [D-CA] 04/02/2009
Sen. Kaufman, Edward E. [D-DE] 06/01/2009
Sen. Udall, Mark [D-CO] 06/08/2009
Sen. Pryor, Mark L. [D-AR] 06/25/2009
Sen. Sanders, Bernard [I-VT] 09/13/2010