Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Sen. Mikulski, Barbara A. [D-MD]* 03/03/2009
Sen. Reed, Jack [D-RI]* 03/03/2009
Sen. Casey, Robert P., Jr. [D-PA]* 03/03/2009
Sen. Levin, Carl [D-MI]* 03/03/2009
Sen. Baucus, Max [D-MT] 04/28/2009
Sen. Gillibrand, Kirsten E. [D-NY] 04/28/2009
Sen. Webb, Jim [D-VA] 09/14/2009
Sen. Byrd, Robert C. [D-WV] 01/28/2010
Sen. Specter, Arlen [D-PA] 08/05/2010
Sen. Whitehouse, Sheldon [D-RI] 08/05/2010