Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Sen. McCain, John [R-AZ]* 03/04/2009
Sen. Coburn, Tom [R-OK] 03/05/2009
Sen. McCaskill, Claire [D-MO] 03/05/2009
Sen. Udall, Mark [D-CO] 03/16/2009
Sen. Lieberman, Joseph I. [ID-CT] 03/19/2009
Sen. Johanns, Mike [R-NE] 03/26/2009
Sen. Barrasso, John [R-WY] 09/14/2009
Sen. Warner, Mark R. [D-VA] 10/01/2009
Sen. LeMieux, George S. [R-FL] 10/07/2009
Sen. Risch, James E. [R-ID] 11/16/2009