Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Sen. Schumer, Charles E. [D-NY]* 03/05/2009
Sen. Roberts, Pat [R-KS] 03/09/2009
Sen. Klobuchar, Amy [D-MN] 03/09/2009
Sen. McCaskill, Claire [D-MO] 03/11/2009
Sen. Bond, Christopher S. [R-MO] 03/16/2009
Sen. Enzi, Michael B. [R-WY] 03/16/2009
Sen. Johanns, Mike [R-NE] 03/17/2009
Sen. Barrasso, John [R-WY] 03/18/2009
Sen. Grassley, Chuck [R-IA] 03/18/2009
Sen. Brownback, Sam [R-KS] 03/25/2009
Sen. Inhofe, James M. [R-OK] 04/22/2009
Sen. Coburn, Tom [R-OK] 04/28/2009
Sen. Crapo, Mike [R-ID] 05/21/2009