Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Sen. Sessions, Jeff [R-AL]* 03/05/2009
Sen. Bingaman, Jeff [D-NM]* 03/05/2009
Sen. Feinstein, Dianne [D-CA]* 03/05/2009
Sen. Kerry, John F. [D-MA]* 03/05/2009
Sen. Lincoln, Blanche L. [D-AR]* 03/05/2009
Sen. Mikulski, Barbara A. [D-MD]* 03/05/2009
Sen. Snowe, Olympia J. [R-ME]* 03/05/2009
Sen. Vitter, David [R-LA]* 03/05/2009
Sen. Inhofe, James M. [R-OK]* 03/05/2009
Sen. Specter, Arlen [R-PA] 03/11/2009
Sen. Landrieu, Mary L. [D-LA] 03/12/2009
Sen. Durbin, Richard [D-IL] 03/12/2009
Sen. Lautenberg, Frank R. [D-NJ] 03/12/2009
Sen. Boxer, Barbara [D-CA] 03/16/2009
Sen. Casey, Robert P., Jr. [D-PA] 03/16/2009
Sen. Martinez, Mel [R-FL] 03/17/2009
Sen. Byrd, Robert C. [D-WV] 03/18/2009
Sen. Begich, Mark [D-AK] 03/18/2009
Sen. Burris, Roland [D-IL] 03/23/2009
Sen. Johnson, Tim [D-SD] 03/23/2009
Sen. Harkin, Tom [D-IA] 03/23/2009
Sen. Webb, Jim [D-VA] 03/30/2009
Sen. Kaufman, Edward E. [D-DE] 03/30/2009
Sen. Udall, Tom [D-NM] 04/02/2009
Sen. Udall, Mark [D-CO] 04/20/2009
Sen. Cantwell, Maria [D-WA] 04/20/2009
Sen. Wyden, Ron [D-OR] 04/20/2009
Sen. Baucus, Max [D-MT] 04/20/2009
Sen. Alexander, Lamar [R-TN] 04/20/2009
Sen. Bond, Christopher S. [R-MO] 04/20/2009
Sen. Cardin, Benjamin L. [D-MD] 04/20/2009
Sen. Dodd, Christopher J. [D-CT] 04/21/2009
Sen. Menendez, Robert [D-NJ] 04/23/2009
Sen. Risch, James E. [R-ID] 04/28/2009
Sen. Isakson, Johnny [R-GA] 04/28/2009
Sen. Warner, Mark R. [D-VA] 04/28/2009
Sen. Collins, Susan M. [R-ME] 04/28/2009
Sen. Murkowski, Lisa [R-AK] 04/28/2009
Sen. Cochran, Thad [R-MS] 04/29/2009
Sen. Sanders, Bernard [I-VT] 05/05/2009
Sen. Tester, Jon [D-MT] 05/05/2009
Sen. Whitehouse, Sheldon [D-RI] 05/05/2009
Sen. Thune, John [R-SD] 05/12/2009
Sen. Burr, Richard [R-NC] 05/14/2009
Sen. Brownback, Sam [R-KS] 05/21/2009
Sen. Murray, Patty [D-WA] 06/03/2009
Sen. Lieberman, Joseph I. [ID-CT] 06/09/2009
Sen. Johanns, Mike [R-NE] 06/19/2009
Sen. Dorgan, Byron L. [D-ND] 07/15/2009
Sen. Pryor, Mark L. [D-AR] 07/15/2009
Sen. Bennet, Michael F. [D-CO] 07/16/2009
Sen. Hutchison, Kay Bailey [R-TX] 09/14/2009
Sen. McCaskill, Claire [D-MO] 11/03/2009
Sen. LeMieux, George S. [R-FL] 11/04/2009
Sen. Hagan, Kay [D-NC] 03/01/2010
Sen. Nelson, Ben [D-NE] 04/13/2010
Sen. Stabenow, Debbie [D-MI] 06/16/2010
Sen. Brown, Sherrod [D-OH] 06/28/2010
Sen. Klobuchar, Amy [D-MN] 09/14/2010
Sen. Schumer, Charles E. [D-NY] 09/21/2010
Sen. Leahy, Patrick J. [D-VT] 11/17/2010