Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Sen. Cochran, Thad [R-MS]* 03/05/2009
Sen. Leahy, Patrick J. [D-VT]* 03/05/2009
Sen. Menendez, Robert [D-NJ]* 03/05/2009
Sen. Pryor, Mark L. [D-AR]* 03/05/2009
Sen. Whitehouse, Sheldon [D-RI] 04/21/2009
Sen. Begich, Mark [D-AK] 06/04/2009
Sen. Landrieu, Mary L. [D-LA] 06/09/2009
Sen. Casey, Robert P., Jr. [D-PA] 07/06/2009
Sen. Schumer, Charles E. [D-NY] 08/03/2009
Sen. Stabenow, Debbie [D-MI] 08/05/2009
Sen. Franken, Al [D-MN] 09/15/2009
Sen. Specter, Arlen [D-PA] 12/18/2009
Sen. Klobuchar, Amy [D-MN] 02/04/2010
Sen. Bayh, Evan [D-IN] 07/27/2010