Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Sen. Hutchison, Kay Bailey [R-TX]* 03/06/2009
Sen. Begich, Mark [D-AK]* 03/06/2009
Sen. Udall, Tom [D-NM]* 03/06/2009
Sen. Boxer, Barbara [D-CA] 03/19/2009
Sen. Johnson, Tim [D-SD] 03/19/2009
Sen. Klobuchar, Amy [D-MN] 03/19/2009
Sen. Shaheen, Jeanne [D-NH] 03/19/2009
Sen. Schumer, Charles E. [D-NY] 03/23/2009
Sen. Kaufman, Edward E. [D-DE] 03/23/2009
Sen. Brown, Sherrod [D-OH] 03/31/2009
Sen. Bingaman, Jeff [D-NM] 04/20/2009
Sen. Burris, Roland [D-IL] 04/20/2009
Sen. Leahy, Patrick J. [D-VT] 10/27/2009
Sen. Lincoln, Blanche L. [D-AR] 10/27/2009