Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Sen. Durbin, Richard [D-IL] 03/10/2009
Sen. Lincoln, Blanche L. [D-AR] 03/10/2009
Sen. Kerry, John F. [D-MA] 03/10/2009
Sen. Kennedy, Edward M. [D-MA] 03/10/2009
Sen. Lieberman, Joseph I. [ID-CT] 03/10/2009
Sen. Brown, Sherrod [D-OH] 03/10/2009
Sen. Whitehouse, Sheldon [D-RI] 03/10/2009
Sen. Johnson, Tim [D-SD] 03/10/2009
Sen. Wyden, Ron [D-OR] 03/10/2009
Sen. Shelby, Richard C. [R-AL] 03/10/2009
Sen. Murray, Patty [D-WA] 03/11/2009
Sen. Dorgan, Byron L. [D-ND] 03/12/2009
Sen. Cardin, Benjamin L. [D-MD] 03/12/2009
Sen. Schumer, Charles E. [D-NY] 03/12/2009
Sen. Mikulski, Barbara A. [D-MD] 03/12/2009
Sen. Lautenberg, Frank R. [D-NJ] 03/16/2009
Sen. Boxer, Barbara [D-CA] 03/16/2009
Sen. Specter, Arlen [R-PA] 03/17/2009
Sen. Vitter, David [R-LA] 03/18/2009
Sen. Cochran, Thad [R-MS] 03/19/2009
Sen. Tester, Jon [D-MT] 03/23/2009
Sen. Burris, Roland [D-IL] 03/23/2009
Sen. Sessions, Jeff [R-AL] 03/25/2009
Sen. Menendez, Robert [D-NJ] 04/01/2009
Sen. Harkin, Tom [D-IA] 04/02/2009
Sen. Snowe, Olympia J. [R-ME] 04/20/2009
Sen. Nelson, Bill [D-FL] 04/20/2009
Sen. Collins, Susan M. [R-ME] 04/20/2009
Sen. Casey, Robert P., Jr. [D-PA] 04/20/2009
Sen. Dodd, Christopher J. [D-CT] 04/21/2009
Sen. Udall, Tom [D-NM] 04/23/2009
Sen. Sanders, Bernard [I-VT] 05/04/2009
Sen. Begich, Mark [D-AK] 05/04/2009
Sen. Hutchison, Kay Bailey [R-TX] 05/14/2009
Sen. Bennet, Michael F. [D-CO] 05/19/2009
Sen. Bingaman, Jeff [D-NM] 05/19/2009
Sen. Feinstein, Dianne [D-CA] 06/03/2009
Sen. Udall, Mark [D-CO] 06/03/2009
Sen. Brownback, Sam [R-KS] 06/17/2009
Sen. Leahy, Patrick J. [D-VT] 06/25/2009
Sen. Warner, Mark R. [D-VA] 09/22/2009
Sen. Murkowski, Lisa [R-AK] 09/23/2009
Sen. Baucus, Max [D-MT] 10/15/2009
Sen. LeMieux, George S. [R-FL] 10/28/2009
Sen. Landrieu, Mary L. [D-LA] 06/25/2010