Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Sen. Murkowski, Lisa [R-AK]* 03/10/2009
Sen. Boxer, Barbara [D-CA]* 03/10/2009
Sen. Wyden, Ron [D-OR]* 03/10/2009
Sen. Udall, Tom [D-NM]* 03/10/2009
Sen. Cantwell, Maria [D-WA]* 03/10/2009
Sen. Tester, Jon [D-MT]* 03/10/2009
Sen. Johnson, Tim [D-SD]* 03/10/2009
Sen. Murray, Patty [D-WA]* 03/10/2009
Sen. Udall, Mark [D-CO]* 03/10/2009
Sen. Hatch, Orrin G. [R-UT]* 03/10/2009
Sen. Thune, John [R-SD] 03/12/2009
Sen. Bennet, Michael F. [D-CO] 03/26/2009
Sen. Merkley, Jeff [D-OR] 04/28/2009
Sen. Stabenow, Debbie [D-MI] 05/06/2009