Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Sen. Schumer, Charles E. [D-NY]* 03/10/2009
Sen. Kennedy, Edward M. [D-MA]* 03/10/2009
Sen. Sanders, Bernard [I-VT] 05/04/2009
Sen. Whitehouse, Sheldon [D-RI] 05/13/2009
Sen. Merkley, Jeff [D-OR] 05/20/2009
Sen. Franken, Al [D-MN] 08/04/2009