Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Sen. Bunning, Jim [R-KY]* 03/11/2009
Sen. Shelby, Richard C. [R-AL]* 03/11/2009
Sen. DeMint, Jim [R-SC]* 03/11/2009
Sen. Cornyn, John [R-TX]* 03/11/2009
Sen. Ensign, John [R-NV]* 03/11/2009
Sen. Coburn, Tom [R-OK]* 03/11/2009
Sen. Risch, James E. [R-ID]* 03/11/2009
Sen. Inhofe, James M. [R-OK]* 03/11/2009
Sen. Enzi, Michael B. [R-WY]* 03/11/2009
Sen. Sessions, Jeff [R-AL]* 03/11/2009
Sen. Bond, Christopher S. [R-MO]* 03/11/2009
Sen. Cochran, Thad [R-MS] 03/12/2009
Sen. Barrasso, John [R-WY] 03/26/2009
Sen. Hutchison, Kay Bailey [R-TX] 06/02/2009
Sen. Crapo, Mike [R-ID] 02/02/2010
Sen. Brownback, Sam [R-KS] 02/02/2010
Sen. Thune, John [R-SD] 02/04/2010
Sen. Wicker, Roger F. [R-MS] 02/04/2010