Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Sen. Casey, Robert P., Jr. [D-PA]* 03/12/2009
Sen. Johanns, Mike [R-NE]* 03/12/2009
Sen. Sanders, Bernard [I-VT]* 03/12/2009
Sen. Collins, Susan M. [R-ME] 03/19/2009
Sen. Menendez, Robert [D-NJ] 04/21/2009
Sen. Baucus, Max [D-MT] 04/30/2009
Sen. Gillibrand, Kirsten E. [D-NY] 04/30/2009
Sen. Feingold, Russell D. [D-WI] 05/04/2009
Sen. Burris, Roland [D-IL] 05/06/2009
Sen. Landrieu, Mary L. [D-LA] 05/12/2009
Sen. McCaskill, Claire [D-MO] 05/12/2009
Sen. Lambert, Blanche M. [D-AR] 05/12/2009
Sen. Cochran, Thad [R-MS] 05/20/2009
Sen. Cardin, Benjamin L. [D-MD] 06/03/2009
Sen. Udall, Mark [D-CO] 06/04/2009
Sen. Snowe, Olympia J. [R-ME] 07/30/2009
Sen. Lautenberg, Frank R. [D-NJ] 08/03/2009
Sen. Murkowski, Lisa [R-AK] 09/10/2009