Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Sen. Durbin, Richard [D-IL]* 03/12/2009
Sen. Levin, Carl [D-MI] 03/23/2009
Sen. Harkin, Tom [D-IA] 03/23/2009
Sen. Whitehouse, Sheldon [D-RI] 03/23/2009
Sen. Leahy, Patrick J. [D-VT] 03/24/2009
Sen. Stabenow, Debbie [D-MI] 06/01/2009
Sen. Begich, Mark [D-AK] 03/10/2010