Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Sen. Snowe, Olympia J. [R-ME]* 03/12/2009
Sen. Johnson, Tim [D-SD]* 03/12/2009
Sen. Alexander, Lamar [R-TN]* 03/12/2009
Sen. Durbin, Richard [D-IL]* 03/12/2009
Sen. Dorgan, Byron L. [D-ND] 09/25/2009
Sen. Gillibrand, Kirsten E. [D-NY] 10/22/2009
Sen. Casey, Robert P., Jr. [D-PA] 11/18/2009
Sen. Udall, Tom [D-NM] 12/10/2009
Sen. Johanns, Mike [R-NE] 12/10/2009
Sen. Begich, Mark [D-AK] 12/14/2009
Sen. Bingaman, Jeff [D-NM] 12/15/2009
Sen. Landrieu, Mary L. [D-LA] 12/21/2009
Sen. Collins, Susan M. [R-ME] 06/21/2010