Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Sen. Carper, Thomas R. [D-DE]* 03/12/2009
Sen. Specter, Arlen [R-PA] 04/02/2009
Sen. Leahy, Patrick J. [D-VT] 05/04/2009
Sen. Sanders, Bernard [I-VT] 05/04/2009
Sen. Begich, Mark [D-AK] 05/04/2009
Sen. Whitehouse, Sheldon [D-RI] 06/22/2009
Sen. Levin, Carl [D-MI] 09/08/2009
Sen. Nelson, Bill [D-FL] 10/05/2009
Sen. Klobuchar, Amy [D-MN] 10/21/2009
Sen. Cardin, Benjamin L. [D-MD] 11/17/2009
Sen. Durbin, Richard [D-IL] 11/17/2009
Sen. Gillibrand, Kirsten E. [D-NY] 12/01/2009
Sen. Lincoln, Blanche L. [D-AR] 04/20/2010
Sen. Franken, Al [D-MN] 05/12/2010