Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Sen. Collins, Susan M. [R-ME]* 03/16/2009
Sen. Inhofe, James M. [R-OK] 03/18/2009
Sen. Whitehouse, Sheldon [D-RI] 03/19/2009
Sen. Lieberman, Joseph I. [ID-CT] 03/19/2009
Sen. Dodd, Christopher J. [D-CT] 03/26/2009
Sen. Kerry, John F. [D-MA] 03/26/2009
Sen. Boxer, Barbara [D-CA] 03/26/2009
Sen. Wyden, Ron [D-OR] 03/30/2009
Sen. Bennet, Michael F. [D-CO] 03/31/2009
Sen. Murray, Patty [D-WA] 03/31/2009
Sen. Landrieu, Mary L. [D-LA] 04/02/2009
Sen. Bingaman, Jeff [D-NM] 04/20/2009
Sen. Kennedy, Edward M. [D-MA] 04/28/2009
Sen. Begich, Mark [D-AK] 04/28/2009
Sen. Webb, Jim [D-VA] 07/07/2009
Sen. Brown, Sherrod [D-OH] 07/13/2009
Sen. Durbin, Richard [D-IL] 09/15/2009
Sen. Menendez, Robert [D-NJ] 11/18/2009
Sen. Casey, Robert P., Jr. [D-PA] 12/14/2010