Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Sen. Isakson, Johnny [R-GA]* 03/16/2009
Sen. Tester, Jon [D-MT]* 03/16/2009
Sen. Chambliss, Saxby [R-GA] 03/23/2009
Sen. Specter, Arlen [R-PA] 04/02/2009
Sen. Hatch, Orrin G. [R-UT] 12/05/2009
Sen. Bennett, Robert F. [R-UT] 12/11/2009