Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Sen. Bennet, Michael F. [D-CO] 03/26/2009
Sen. Barrasso, John [R-WY] 05/20/2009
Sen. Shaheen, Jeanne [D-NH] 05/20/2009
Sen. Feinstein, Dianne [D-CA] 06/23/2009
Sen. Ensign, John [R-NV] 06/23/2009
Sen. Risch, James E. [R-ID] 06/23/2009
Sen. Sanders, Bernard [I-VT] 08/03/2009
Sen. Reid, Harry [D-NV] 09/14/2009
Sen. Enzi, Michael B. [R-WY] 09/17/2009
Sen. Leahy, Patrick J. [D-VT] 09/29/2009
Sen. Stabenow, Debbie [D-MI] 10/19/2009
Sen. Gregg, Judd [R-NH] 10/22/2009
Sen. Bennett, Robert F. [R-UT] 10/27/2009
Sen. Cantwell, Maria [D-WA] 10/27/2009
Sen. Murray, Patty [D-WA] 10/27/2009