There are 5 versions of this bill. View text

Click the check-box to add or remove the section, click the text link to scroll to that section.
Titles Actions Overview All Actions Cosponsors Committees Related Bills Subjects Latest Summary All Summaries

Titles (1)

Official Titles

Official Titles - Senate

Official Titles as Introduced

A bill to award a Congressional Gold Medal to the Women Airforce Service Pilots ("WASP").


Actions Overview (7)

Date
07/01/2009Became Public Law No: 111-40. (TXT | PDF)
07/01/2009Signed by President.
06/24/2009Presented to President.
06/16/2009Passed/agreed to in House: On motion to suspend the rules and pass the bill Agreed to by voice vote.(text: CR H6840-6841)
05/20/2009Passed/agreed to in Senate: Passed Senate with amendments by Unanimous Consent.(text: CR S5765-5766)
05/20/2009Senate Committee on Banking, Housing, and Urban Affairs discharged by Unanimous Consent.
03/17/2009Introduced in Senate

All Actions (20)

Date Chamber
07/01/2009Became Public Law No: 111-40. (TXT | PDF)
07/01/2009Signed by President.
06/24/2009SenatePresented to President.
06/16/2009-1:09pmHouseMotion to reconsider laid on the table Agreed to without objection.
06/16/2009-1:09pmHouseOn motion to suspend the rules and pass the bill Agreed to by voice vote. (text: CR H6840-6841)
06/16/2009-12:49pmHouseDEBATE - The House proceeded with forty minutes of debate on S. 614.
06/16/2009-12:49pmHouseConsidered under suspension of the rules. (consideration: CR H6840-6843)
06/16/2009-12:49pmHouseMr. Green, Al moved to suspend the rules and pass the bill.
05/21/2009HouseReferred to House Administration
05/21/2009HouseReferred to House Financial Services
05/21/2009HouseReferred to the Committee on Financial Services, and in addition to the Committee on House Administration, for a period to be subsequently determined by the Speaker, in each case for consideration of such provisions as fall within the jurisdiction of the committee concerned.
05/21/2009SenateMessage on Senate action sent to the House.
05/21/2009-10:03amHouseReceived in the House.
05/20/2009SenatePassed Senate with amendments by Unanimous Consent. (text: CR S5765-5766)
05/20/2009SenateS.Amdt.1200 Amendment SA 1200 agreed to in Senate by Unanimous Consent.
05/20/2009SenateS.Amdt.1200 Amendment SA 1200 proposed by Senator Reid for Senator Hutchison. (consideration: CR S5765; text: CR S5765) Of a perfecting nature.
05/20/2009SenateMeasure laid before Senate by unanimous consent. (consideration: CR S5765-5766)
05/20/2009SenateSenate Committee on Banking, Housing, and Urban Affairs discharged by Unanimous Consent.
03/17/2009SenateRead twice and referred to the Committee on Banking, Housing, and Urban Affairs.
03/17/2009SenateSponsor introductory remarks on measure. (CR S3176-3177)

Cosponsors (75)

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Sen. Mikulski, Barbara A. [D-MD]* 03/17/2009
Sen. Feinstein, Dianne [D-CA]* 03/17/2009
Sen. Landrieu, Mary L. [D-LA]* 03/17/2009
Sen. Stabenow, Debbie [D-MI]* 03/17/2009
Sen. Lincoln, Blanche L. [D-AR]* 03/17/2009
Sen. Murray, Patty [D-WA]* 03/17/2009
Sen. Collins, Susan M. [R-ME]* 03/17/2009
Sen. Snowe, Olympia J. [R-ME]* 03/17/2009
Sen. Boxer, Barbara [D-CA]* 03/17/2009
Sen. Gillibrand, Kirsten E. [D-NY]* 03/17/2009
Sen. Shaheen, Jeanne [D-NH]* 03/17/2009
Sen. Murkowski, Lisa [R-AK]* 03/17/2009
Sen. Klobuchar, Amy [D-MN]* 03/17/2009
Sen. Hagan, Kay R. [D-NC]* 03/17/2009
Sen. Cantwell, Maria [D-WA]* 03/17/2009
Sen. McCaskill, Claire [D-MO]* 03/17/2009
Sen. Harkin, Tom [D-IA] 03/19/2009
Sen. Brown, Sherrod [D-OH] 03/19/2009
Sen. Inhofe, James M. [R-OK] 03/19/2009
Sen. Burris, Roland [D-IL] 03/19/2009
Sen. Byrd, Robert C. [D-WV] 03/19/2009
Sen. Cardin, Benjamin L. [D-MD] 03/19/2009
Sen. Schumer, Charles E. [D-NY] 03/23/2009
Sen. Kaufman, Edward E. [D-DE] 03/23/2009
Sen. Wyden, Ron [D-OR] 03/24/2009
Sen. Bond, Christopher S. [R-MO] 03/25/2009
Sen. Cochran, Thad [R-MS] 03/26/2009
Sen. Chambliss, Saxby [R-GA] 03/26/2009
Sen. Vitter, David [R-LA] 03/26/2009
Sen. Alexander, Lamar [R-TN] 03/30/2009
Sen. Begich, Mark [D-AK] 03/30/2009
Sen. Cornyn, John [R-TX] 03/30/2009
Sen. Pryor, Mark L. [D-AR] 04/01/2009
Sen. Lieberman, Joseph I. [ID-CT] 04/01/2009
Sen. Brownback, Sam [R-KS] 04/02/2009
Sen. Coburn, Tom [R-OK] 04/20/2009
Sen. Baucus, Max [D-MT] 04/20/2009
Sen. Udall, Mark [D-CO] 04/20/2009
Sen. Durbin, Richard J. [D-IL] 04/20/2009
Sen. Nelson, Bill [D-FL] 04/21/2009
Sen. Isakson, Johnny [R-GA] 04/21/2009
Sen. Lautenberg, Frank R. [D-NJ] 04/22/2009
Sen. Burr, Richard [R-NC] 04/22/2009
Sen. Risch, James E. [R-ID] 04/22/2009
Sen. Levin, Carl [D-MI] 04/23/2009
Sen. Sanders, Bernard [I-VT] 04/23/2009
Sen. Bennett, Robert F. [R-UT] 04/24/2009
Sen. Thune, John [R-SD] 04/24/2009
Sen. Roberts, Pat [R-KS] 04/27/2009
Sen. Conrad, Kent [D-ND] 04/27/2009
Sen. Tester, Jon [D-MT] 04/27/2009
Sen. Menendez, Robert [D-NJ] 04/27/2009
Sen. Reid, Harry [D-NV] 04/28/2009
Sen. Martinez, Mel [R-FL] 04/30/2009
Sen. Reed, Jack [D-RI] 04/30/2009
Sen. Rockefeller, John D., IV [D-WV] 05/01/2009
Sen. Nelson, Ben [D-NE] 05/04/2009
Sen. Specter, Arlen [D-PA] 05/05/2009
Sen. Lugar, Richard G. [R-IN] 05/05/2009
Sen. Kennedy, Edward M. [D-MA] 05/06/2009
Sen. Carper, Thomas R. [D-DE] 05/07/2009
Sen. Warner, Mark R. [D-VA] 05/07/2009
Sen. Wicker, Roger F. [R-MS] 05/07/2009
Sen. Whitehouse, Sheldon [D-RI] 05/07/2009
Sen. Bingaman, Jeff [D-NM] 05/07/2009
Sen. Bennet, Michael F. [D-CO] 05/11/2009
Sen. Udall, Tom [D-NM] 05/11/2009
Sen. McCain, John [R-AZ] 05/11/2009
Sen. Ensign, John [R-NV] 05/11/2009
Sen. Feingold, Russell D. [D-WI] 05/11/2009
Sen. Webb, Jim [D-VA] 05/12/2009
Sen. Sessions, Jeff [R-AL] 05/14/2009
Sen. Akaka, Daniel K. [D-HI] 05/18/2009
Sen. Hatch, Orrin G. [R-UT] 05/19/2009
Sen. Casey, Robert P., Jr. [D-PA] 06/03/2009

Committees (3)

Committees, subcommittees and links to reports associated with this bill are listed here, as well as the nature and date of committee activity and Congressional report number.

Committee / Subcommittee Date Activity Reports
Senate Banking, Housing, and Urban Affairs03/17/2009 Referred to
05/20/2009 Discharged from
House Financial Services05/21/2009 Referred to
House Administration05/21/2009 Referred to

A related bill may be a companion measure, an identical bill, a procedurally-related measure, or one with text similarities. Bill relationships are identified by the House, the Senate, or CRS, and refer only to same-congress measures.


Subjects (6)


Latest Summary (4)

There are 4 summaries for S.614. View summaries

Shown Here:
Public Law No: 111-40 (07/01/2009)

(This measure has not been amended since it was passed by the Senate on May 20, 2009. The summary of that version is repeated here.)

Directs the President pro tempore of the Senate and the Speaker of the House of Representatives to make appropriate arrangements for the award of a single gold medal in honor of the Women Airforce Service Pilots (WASP) collectively, in honor of their pioneering military service and exemplary record, which forged revolutionary reform in the U.S. Armed Forces.

Requires the medal to be displayed at the Smithsonian Institution (Smithsonian) after its award.

Expresses the sense of Congress that the Smithsonian shall make the medal available for display elsewhere, particularly at other locations associated with the WASP.