Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Sen. Mikulski, Barbara A. [D-MD]* 03/17/2009
Sen. Feinstein, Dianne [D-CA]* 03/17/2009
Sen. Landrieu, Mary L. [D-LA]* 03/17/2009
Sen. Stabenow, Debbie [D-MI]* 03/17/2009
Sen. Lincoln, Blanche L. [D-AR]* 03/17/2009
Sen. Murray, Patty [D-WA]* 03/17/2009
Sen. Collins, Susan M. [R-ME]* 03/17/2009
Sen. Snowe, Olympia J. [R-ME]* 03/17/2009
Sen. Boxer, Barbara [D-CA]* 03/17/2009
Sen. Gillibrand, Kirsten E. [D-NY]* 03/17/2009
Sen. Shaheen, Jeanne [D-NH]* 03/17/2009
Sen. Murkowski, Lisa [R-AK]* 03/17/2009
Sen. Klobuchar, Amy [D-MN]* 03/17/2009
Sen. Hagan, Kay [D-NC]* 03/17/2009
Sen. Cantwell, Maria [D-WA]* 03/17/2009
Sen. McCaskill, Claire [D-MO]* 03/17/2009
Sen. Harkin, Tom [D-IA] 03/19/2009
Sen. Brown, Sherrod [D-OH] 03/19/2009
Sen. Inhofe, James M. [R-OK] 03/19/2009
Sen. Burris, Roland [D-IL] 03/19/2009
Sen. Byrd, Robert C. [D-WV] 03/19/2009
Sen. Cardin, Benjamin L. [D-MD] 03/19/2009
Sen. Schumer, Charles E. [D-NY] 03/23/2009
Sen. Kaufman, Edward E. [D-DE] 03/23/2009
Sen. Wyden, Ron [D-OR] 03/24/2009
Sen. Bond, Christopher S. [R-MO] 03/25/2009
Sen. Cochran, Thad [R-MS] 03/26/2009
Sen. Chambliss, Saxby [R-GA] 03/26/2009
Sen. Vitter, David [R-LA] 03/26/2009
Sen. Alexander, Lamar [R-TN] 03/30/2009
Sen. Begich, Mark [D-AK] 03/30/2009
Sen. Cornyn, John [R-TX] 03/30/2009
Sen. Pryor, Mark L. [D-AR] 04/01/2009
Sen. Lieberman, Joseph I. [ID-CT] 04/01/2009
Sen. Brownback, Sam [R-KS] 04/02/2009
Sen. Coburn, Tom [R-OK] 04/20/2009
Sen. Baucus, Max [D-MT] 04/20/2009
Sen. Udall, Mark [D-CO] 04/20/2009
Sen. Durbin, Richard [D-IL] 04/20/2009
Sen. Nelson, Bill [D-FL] 04/21/2009
Sen. Isakson, Johnny [R-GA] 04/21/2009
Sen. Lautenberg, Frank R. [D-NJ] 04/22/2009
Sen. Burr, Richard [R-NC] 04/22/2009
Sen. Risch, James E. [R-ID] 04/22/2009
Sen. Levin, Carl [D-MI] 04/23/2009
Sen. Sanders, Bernard [I-VT] 04/23/2009
Sen. Bennett, Robert F. [R-UT] 04/24/2009
Sen. Thune, John [R-SD] 04/24/2009
Sen. Roberts, Pat [R-KS] 04/27/2009
Sen. Conrad, Kent [D-ND] 04/27/2009
Sen. Tester, Jon [D-MT] 04/27/2009
Sen. Menendez, Robert [D-NJ] 04/27/2009
Sen. Reid, Harry [D-NV] 04/28/2009
Sen. Martinez, Mel [R-FL] 04/30/2009
Sen. Reed, Jack [D-RI] 04/30/2009
Sen. Rockefeller, John D., IV [D-WV] 05/01/2009
Sen. Nelson, Ben [D-NE] 05/04/2009
Sen. Specter, Arlen [D-PA] 05/05/2009
Sen. Lugar, Richard G. [R-IN] 05/05/2009
Sen. Kennedy, Edward M. [D-MA] 05/06/2009
Sen. Carper, Thomas R. [D-DE] 05/07/2009
Sen. Warner, Mark R. [D-VA] 05/07/2009
Sen. Wicker, Roger F. [R-MS] 05/07/2009
Sen. Whitehouse, Sheldon [D-RI] 05/07/2009
Sen. Bingaman, Jeff [D-NM] 05/07/2009
Sen. Bennet, Michael F. [D-CO] 05/11/2009
Sen. Udall, Tom [D-NM] 05/11/2009
Sen. McCain, John [R-AZ] 05/11/2009
Sen. Ensign, John [R-NV] 05/11/2009
Sen. Feingold, Russell D. [D-WI] 05/11/2009
Sen. Webb, Jim [D-VA] 05/12/2009
Sen. Sessions, Jeff [R-AL] 05/14/2009
Sen. Akaka, Daniel K. [D-HI] 05/18/2009
Sen. Hatch, Orrin G. [R-UT] 05/19/2009
Sen. Casey, Robert P., Jr. [D-PA] 06/03/2009