Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Sen. Corker, Bob [R-TN]* 03/17/2009
Sen. Murray, Patty [D-WA]* 03/17/2009
Sen. Collins, Susan M. [R-ME] 04/20/2009
Sen. Shaheen, Jeanne [D-NH] 04/30/2009
Sen. Burris, Roland [D-IL] 04/30/2009
Sen. Isakson, Johnny [R-GA] 06/15/2009
Sen. Boxer, Barbara [D-CA] 06/22/2009
Sen. Reed, Jack [D-RI] 06/25/2009
Sen. Brown, Sherrod [D-OH] 07/06/2009
Sen. Whitehouse, Sheldon [D-RI] 07/08/2009
Sen. Dorgan, Byron L. [D-ND] 07/08/2009
Sen. Cantwell, Maria [D-WA] 07/15/2009
Sen. Lieberman, Joseph I. [ID-CT] 07/20/2009
Sen. Sanders, Bernard [I-VT] 07/23/2009
Sen. Bond, Christopher S. [R-MO] 07/24/2009
Sen. Dodd, Christopher J. [D-CT] 07/27/2009
Sen. Cardin, Benjamin L. [D-MD] 08/03/2009
Sen. Reid, Harry [D-NV] 09/08/2009
Sen. Feinstein, Dianne [D-CA] 09/08/2009
Sen. Gillibrand, Kirsten E. [D-NY] 09/24/2009
Sen. Burr, Richard [R-NC] 10/05/2009
Sen. Snowe, Olympia J. [R-ME] 10/07/2009
Sen. Johanns, Mike [R-NE] 10/08/2009
Sen. Kirk, Paul Grattan, Jr. [D-MA] 10/14/2009
Sen. Specter, Arlen [D-PA] 10/22/2009
Sen. Roberts, Pat [R-KS] 12/04/2009
Sen. Kaufman, Edward E. [D-DE] 12/04/2009
Sen. Lautenberg, Frank R. [D-NJ] 12/23/2009
Sen. Landrieu, Mary L. [D-LA] 01/20/2010
Sen. Casey, Robert P., Jr. [D-PA] 01/20/2010
Sen. Johnson, Tim [D-SD] 04/12/2010
Sen. Leahy, Patrick J. [D-VT] 05/24/2010
Sen. Merkley, Jeff [D-OR] 06/21/2010