Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Sen. Brownback, Sam [R-KS]* 03/18/2009
Sen. Collins, Susan M. [R-ME]* 03/18/2009
Sen. Johnson, Tim [D-SD]* 03/18/2009
Sen. Murray, Patty [D-WA]* 03/18/2009
Sen. Kohl, Herb [D-WI] 06/18/2009
Sen. Inouye, Daniel K. [D-HI] 06/23/2009
Sen. Bingaman, Jeff [D-NM] 07/15/2009
Sen. Begich, Mark [D-AK] 08/07/2009
Sen. Lieberman, Joseph I. [ID-CT] 09/24/2009