Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Sen. Tester, Jon [D-MT]* 03/18/2009
Sen. Chambliss, Saxby [R-GA]* 03/18/2009
Sen. Crapo, Mike [R-ID] 03/19/2009
Sen. Wicker, Roger F. [R-MS] 04/20/2009
Sen. Cochran, Thad [R-MS] 04/23/2009
Sen. Sessions, Jeff [R-AL] 04/29/2009
Sen. Isakson, Johnny [R-GA] 06/11/2009