Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Sen. Snowe, Olympia J. [R-ME]* 03/19/2009
Sen. Nelson, Bill [D-FL]* 03/19/2009
Sen. Wicker, Roger F. [R-MS]* 03/19/2009
Sen. Warner, Mark R. [D-VA] 05/05/2009
Sen. Hutchison, Kay Bailey [R-TX] 05/05/2009
Sen. Thune, John [R-SD] 06/15/2009
Sen. Klobuchar, Amy [D-MN] 07/07/2009
Sen. Pryor, Mark L. [D-AR] 07/08/2009
Sen. Conrad, Kent [D-ND] 03/15/2010
Sen. Lieberman, Joseph I. [ID-CT] 03/26/2010
Sen. Grassley, Chuck [R-IA] 06/16/2010