Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Sen. Mikulski, Barbara A. [D-MD]* 03/19/2009
Sen. Isakson, Johnny [R-GA] 03/30/2009
Sen. Inouye, Daniel K. [D-HI] 05/14/2009
Sen. Durbin, Richard [D-IL] 05/19/2009
Sen. Rockefeller, John D., IV [D-WV] 05/21/2009
Sen. Baucus, Max [D-MT] 06/02/2009
Sen. Pryor, Mark L. [D-AR] 06/04/2009
Sen. Tester, Jon [D-MT] 06/08/2009
Sen. Coburn, Tom [R-OK] 06/11/2009
Sen. Risch, James E. [R-ID] 06/15/2009
Sen. Wicker, Roger F. [R-MS] 06/16/2009
Sen. Chambliss, Saxby [R-GA] 06/18/2009
Sen. Kennedy, Edward M. [D-MA] 06/22/2009
Sen. Kerry, John F. [D-MA] 06/22/2009
Sen. Akaka, Daniel K. [D-HI] 06/22/2009
Sen. Whitehouse, Sheldon [D-RI] 06/23/2009
Sen. Burris, Roland [D-IL] 06/23/2009
Sen. Begich, Mark [D-AK] 06/23/2009
Sen. Byrd, Robert C. [D-WV] 06/23/2009
Sen. Johnson, Tim [D-SD] 06/24/2009
Sen. Udall, Mark [D-CO] 06/24/2009
Sen. Kaufman, Edward E. [D-DE] 06/24/2009
Sen. Landrieu, Mary L. [D-LA] 07/06/2009
Sen. Roberts, Pat [R-KS] 07/06/2009
Sen. Sanders, Bernard [I-VT] 07/06/2009
Sen. Warner, Mark R. [D-VA] 07/06/2009
Sen. Cochran, Thad [R-MS] 07/08/2009
Sen. Enzi, Michael B. [R-WY] 07/08/2009
Sen. Nelson, Bill [D-FL] 07/14/2009
Sen. Corker, Bob [R-TN] 08/06/2009
Sen. Stabenow, Debbie [D-MI] 09/08/2009
Sen. Alexander, Lamar [R-TN] 09/22/2009
Sen. Barrasso, John [R-WY] 09/23/2009
Sen. Reed, Jack [D-RI] 09/25/2009
Sen. Burr, Richard [R-NC] 10/07/2009
Sen. Feingold, Russell D. [D-WI] 10/22/2009
Sen. Boxer, Barbara [D-CA] 10/27/2009
Sen. Bennett, Robert F. [R-UT] 12/04/2009
Sen. Brown, Sherrod [D-OH] 03/10/2010
Sen. Bennet, Michael F. [D-CO] 03/10/2010
Sen. Levin, Carl [D-MI] 03/11/2010
Sen. Lautenberg, Frank R. [D-NJ] 03/22/2010
Sen. Menendez, Robert [D-NJ] 04/15/2010
Sen. Lincoln, Blanche L. [D-AR] 04/19/2010
Sen. Bayh, Evan [D-IN] 04/21/2010
Sen. Shaheen, Jeanne [D-NH] 04/22/2010
Sen. Brownback, Sam [R-KS] 04/29/2010
Sen. Carper, Thomas R. [D-DE] 05/25/2010
Sen. Schumer, Charles E. [D-NY] 07/12/2010
Sen. Casey, Robert P., Jr. [D-PA] 07/12/2010
Sen. Inhofe, James M. [R-OK] 07/13/2010
Sen. Udall, Tom [D-NM] 07/13/2010
Sen. Gillibrand, Kirsten E. [D-NY] 07/15/2010
Sen. Graham, Lindsey [R-SC] 07/15/2010
Sen. Thune, John [R-SD] 07/15/2010
Sen. Wyden, Ron [D-OR] 07/20/2010
Sen. Feinstein, Dianne [D-CA] 07/20/2010
Sen. Dorgan, Byron L. [D-ND] 07/20/2010
Sen. Hatch, Orrin G. [R-UT] 07/21/2010
Sen. Specter, Arlen [D-PA] 07/22/2010
Sen. Conrad, Kent [D-ND] 07/22/2010
Sen. Nelson, Ben [D-NE] 07/22/2010
Sen. Webb, Jim [D-VA] 07/22/2010
Sen. Crapo, Mike [R-ID] 07/22/2010
Sen. Lieberman, Joseph I. [ID-CT] 07/22/2010
Sen. Sessions, Jeff [R-AL] 07/22/2010
Sen. Merkley, Jeff [D-OR] 07/22/2010
Sen. LeMieux, George S. [R-FL] 07/22/2010
Sen. Collins, Susan M. [R-ME] 07/22/2010
Sen. Bond, Christopher S. [R-MO] 07/26/2010
Sen. Harkin, Tom [D-IA] 07/26/2010
Sen. Hagan, Kay [D-NC] 07/27/2010