Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Sen. Thune, John [R-SD] 04/20/2009
Sen. Begich, Mark [D-AK] 04/20/2009
Sen. Lincoln, Blanche L. [D-AR] 04/28/2009
Sen. Burris, Roland [D-IL] 04/28/2009
Sen. McCaskill, Claire [D-MO] 05/13/2009
Sen. Durbin, Richard [D-IL] 05/18/2009
Sen. Merkley, Jeff [D-OR] 06/22/2009
Sen. Pryor, Mark L. [D-AR] 09/17/2009
Sen. Wyden, Ron [D-OR] 10/15/2009
Sen. Casey, Robert P., Jr. [D-PA] 11/10/2009
Sen. Collins, Susan M. [R-ME] 09/28/2010