Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Sen. Collins, Susan M. [R-ME]* 03/19/2009
Sen. Stabenow, Debbie [D-MI]* 03/19/2009
Sen. Snowe, Olympia J. [R-ME]* 03/19/2009
Sen. Bayh, Evan [D-IN]* 03/19/2009
Sen. Brown, Sherrod [D-OH]* 03/19/2009
Sen. Pryor, Mark L. [D-AR]* 03/19/2009
Sen. Murkowski, Lisa [R-AK] 03/23/2009
Sen. Kerry, John F. [D-MA] 03/25/2009
Sen. Schumer, Charles E. [D-NY] 03/25/2009
Sen. Shaheen, Jeanne [D-NH] 04/02/2009
Sen. Durbin, Richard [D-IL] 04/02/2009
Sen. Udall, Tom [D-NM] 06/08/2009