Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Sen. Brownback, Sam [R-KS]* 03/19/2009
Sen. Kennedy, Edward M. [D-MA]* 03/19/2009
Sen. Lincoln, Blanche L. [D-AR]* 03/19/2009
Sen. Grassley, Chuck [R-IA]* 03/19/2009
Sen. Durbin, Richard [D-IL]* 03/19/2009
Sen. Whitehouse, Sheldon [D-RI]* 03/19/2009
Sen. Inhofe, James M. [R-OK]* 03/19/2009
Sen. Wyden, Ron [D-OR]* 03/19/2009
Sen. Cardin, Benjamin L. [D-MD]* 03/19/2009
Sen. Kerry, John F. [D-MA]* 03/19/2009
Sen. Murkowski, Lisa [R-AK]* 03/19/2009
Sen. Specter, Arlen [R-PA]* 03/19/2009
Sen. Murray, Patty [D-WA]* 03/19/2009
Sen. Collins, Susan M. [R-ME]* 03/19/2009
Sen. Stabenow, Debbie [D-MI]* 03/19/2009
Sen. Roberts, Pat [R-KS]* 03/19/2009
Sen. Cochran, Thad [R-MS]* 03/19/2009
Sen. Casey, Robert P., Jr. [D-PA] 03/25/2009
Sen. Menendez, Robert [D-NJ] 04/02/2009
Sen. Schumer, Charles E. [D-NY] 04/23/2009
Sen. Lautenberg, Frank R. [D-NJ] 04/28/2009
Sen. Lieberman, Joseph I. [ID-CT] 04/28/2009
Sen. Brown, Sherrod [D-OH] 05/04/2009
Sen. Conrad, Kent [D-ND] 05/12/2009
Sen. Leahy, Patrick J. [D-VT] 05/14/2009
Sen. Dodd, Christopher J. [D-CT] 05/19/2009
Sen. Mikulski, Barbara A. [D-MD] 06/01/2009
Sen. Martinez, Mel [R-FL] 06/03/2009
Sen. Reed, Jack [D-RI] 06/03/2009
Sen. Udall, Tom [D-NM] 06/10/2009
Sen. Begich, Mark [D-AK] 06/16/2009
Sen. Udall, Mark [D-CO] 06/16/2009
Sen. Cantwell, Maria [D-WA] 06/16/2009
Sen. Bingaman, Jeff [D-NM] 06/18/2009
Sen. Bennet, Michael F. [D-CO] 06/24/2009
Sen. Landrieu, Mary L. [D-LA] 07/06/2009
Sen. Boxer, Barbara [D-CA] 07/08/2009
Sen. Pryor, Mark L. [D-AR] 07/14/2009
Sen. Johanns, Mike [R-NE] 07/30/2009
Sen. Hutchison, Kay Bailey [R-TX] 09/09/2009
Sen. Bayh, Evan [D-IN] 09/21/2009
Sen. Snowe, Olympia J. [R-ME] 09/22/2009
Sen. Harkin, Tom [D-IA] 10/14/2009
Sen. Baucus, Max [D-MT] 10/15/2009
Sen. Gillibrand, Kirsten E. [D-NY] 10/15/2009
Sen. Sanders, Bernard [I-VT] 10/20/2009
Sen. Klobuchar, Amy [D-MN] 11/04/2009
Sen. Tester, Jon [D-MT] 12/18/2009
Sen. Bond, Christopher S. [R-MO] 12/18/2009
Sen. Vitter, David [R-LA] 01/20/2010
Sen. Merkley, Jeff [D-OR] 06/10/2010