There are 4 versions of this bill. View text

Click the check-box to add or remove the section, click the text link to scroll to that section.
Titles Actions Overview All Actions Cosponsors Committees Related Bills Subjects Latest Summary All Summaries

Titles (4)

Short Titles

Short Titles - Senate

Short Titles as Passed Senate

Oil Spill Prevention Act of 2010

Short Titles as Reported to Senate

Oil Spill Prevention Act of 2009

Short Titles as Introduced

Oil Spill Prevention Act of 2009

Official Titles

Official Titles - Senate

Official Titles as Introduced

A bill to require new vessels for carrying oil fuel to have double hulls, and for other purposes.


Actions Overview (3)

Date
09/29/2010Passed/agreed to in Senate: Passed Senate with an amendment by Unanimous Consent.
06/15/2009Committee on Commerce, Science, and Transportation. Reported by Senator Rockefeller with amendments. With written report No. 111-26.
03/24/2009Introduced in Senate

All Actions (17)

Date Chamber
11/23/2010HouseReferred to the Subcommittee on Border, Maritime, and Global Counterterrorism.
Action By: Committee on Homeland Security
11/15/2010HouseReferred to House Budget
11/15/2010HouseReferred to House Homeland Security
11/15/2010HouseReferred to House Transportation and Infrastructure
11/15/2010HouseReferred to the Committee on Transportation and Infrastructure, and in addition to the Committees on Homeland Security, and the Budget, for a period to be subsequently determined by the Speaker, in each case for consideration of such provisions as fall within the jurisdiction of the committee concerned.
11/15/2010-2:03pmHouseReceived in the House.
09/30/2010SenateMessage on Senate action sent to the House.
09/29/2010SenatePassed Senate with an amendment by Unanimous Consent.
09/29/2010SenateS.Amdt.4688 Amendment SA 4688 agreed to in Senate by Unanimous Consent.
09/29/2010SenateS.Amdt.4688 Amendment SA 4688 proposed by Senator Durbin for Senator Lautenberg. (consideration: CR S7768-7769; text: CR S7768-7769) In the nature of a substitute.
09/29/2010SenateThe committee amendments were withdrawn by Unanimous Consent.
09/29/2010SenateMeasure laid before Senate by unanimous consent. (consideration: CR S7764-7769; text of measure as reported in Senate: CR S7764-7768)
06/15/2009SenatePlaced on Senate Legislative Calendar under General Orders. Calendar No. 77.
06/15/2009SenateCommittee on Commerce, Science, and Transportation. Reported by Senator Rockefeller with amendments. With written report No. 111-26.
05/20/2009SenateCommittee on Commerce, Science, and Transportation. Ordered to be reported with an amendment favorably.
03/24/2009SenateRead twice and referred to the Committee on Commerce, Science, and Transportation.
03/24/2009SenateSponsor introductory remarks on measure. (CR S3685-3686)

Cosponsors (7)

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Sen. Rockefeller, John D., IV [D-WV]* 03/24/2009
Sen. Cantwell, Maria [D-WA]* 03/24/2009
Sen. Boxer, Barbara [D-CA]* 03/24/2009
Sen. Begich, Mark [D-AK]* 03/24/2009
Sen. Vitter, David [R-LA] 06/18/2009
Sen. Snowe, Olympia J. [R-ME] 06/23/2009
Sen. Menendez, Robert [D-NJ] 07/29/2009

Committees (4)

Committees, subcommittees and links to reports associated with this bill are listed here, as well as the nature and date of committee activity and Congressional report number.

Committee / Subcommittee Date Activity Reports
Senate Commerce, Science, and Transportation03/24/2009 Referred to
05/20/2009 Markup by
06/15/2009 Reported by S. Rept. 111-26
House Transportation and Infrastructure11/15/2010 Referred to
House Homeland Security11/15/2010 Referred to
House Homeland Security Subcommittee on Border, Maritime, and Global Counterterrorism11/23/2010 Referred to
House Budget11/15/2010 Referred to

No related bill information was received for S.685.


Latest Summary (3)

There are 3 summaries for S.685. View summaries

Shown Here:
Passed Senate amended (09/29/2010)

Oil Spill Prevention Act of 2010 - (Sec. 2) Requires double hull protection of oil fuel tanks on certain vessels with a tank capacity of at least 600 cubic meters. Defines "oil fuel" as any oil used as fuel in connection with the vessel's propulsion and auxiliary machinery.

(Sec. 3) Directs the Secretary of the department in which the Coast Guard is operating to: (1) provide guidance to all vessel traffic personnel that clearly defines the use of authority to direct or control vessel movement when such direction or control is justified in the interest of safety; and (2) require vessel traffic personnel communications to identify the vessel, rather than the pilot, when vessels are operating in vessel traffic service pilotage areas.

Requires the Secretary to identify, and report to Congress concerning, requirements for the necessary expansion, improvement, or construction of buildings, networks, communications, or other infrastructure to improve the effectiveness of existing vessel traffic service systems, or necessary to support recommended new vessel traffic service systems, including all necessary costs for construction, reconstruction, expansion, or improvement.

Requires a review and validation of the recruiting, retention, training, and expansion of vessel traffic service personnel.

(Sec. 4) Requires that at least one trained and experienced pollution investigator be on duty or on call at all times for each Coast Guard Sector Command.

(Sec. 5) Modifies requirements regarding the duration of merchant mariner's documents and certificates of registry.

(Sec. 6) Authorizes the extending of licenses, certificates of registry, and merchant mariner's documents in specified circumstances. Terminates that authorization on December 31, 2011.

(Sec. 7) Limits to one the number of reports regarding port security terrorism exercises that the Coast Guard is required to submit each year to the House of Representatives Committee on Appropriations.

(Sec. 8) Requires that compliance with the Statutory Pay-As-You-Go Act of 2010 be determined by reference to the latest statement titled "Budgetary Effects of PAYGO Legislation" for this Act.