Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Sen. Cardin, Benjamin L. [D-MD] 04/20/2009
Sen. Brown, Sherrod [D-OH] 04/20/2009
Sen. Schumer, Charles E. [D-NY] 06/01/2009
Sen. Inouye, Daniel K. [D-HI] 06/01/2009
Sen. Stabenow, Debbie [D-MI] 06/01/2009
Sen. Kerry, John F. [D-MA] 06/16/2009
Sen. Levin, Carl [D-MI] 06/25/2009
Sen. Menendez, Robert [D-NJ] 08/03/2009
Sen. Gillibrand, Kirsten E. [D-NY] 08/07/2009
Sen. Begich, Mark [D-AK] 10/07/2009
Sen. Lautenberg, Frank R. [D-NJ] 11/16/2009
Sen. Johnson, Tim [D-SD] 02/23/2010
Sen. Merkley, Jeff [D-OR] 05/03/2010
Sen. Dodd, Christopher J. [D-CT] 06/14/2010