Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Sen. Hatch, Orrin G. [R-UT]* 03/25/2009
Sen. Casey, Robert P., Jr. [D-PA] 06/25/2009
Sen. Burr, Richard [R-NC] 06/25/2009
Sen. Alexander, Lamar [R-TN] 06/25/2009
Sen. Gregg, Judd [R-NH] 06/25/2009
Sen. Risch, James E. [R-ID] 07/10/2009
Sen. Mikulski, Barbara A. [D-MD] 07/16/2009
Sen. Kerry, John F. [D-MA] 07/30/2009
Sen. Reid, Harry [D-NV] 08/05/2009
Sen. Menendez, Robert [D-NJ] 08/05/2009
Sen. Whitehouse, Sheldon [D-RI] 08/06/2009
Sen. Brown, Sherrod [D-OH] 08/06/2009
Sen. Bayh, Evan [D-IN] 08/06/2009
Sen. Specter, Arlen [D-PA] 08/07/2009
Sen. Snowe, Olympia J. [R-ME] 09/08/2009
Sen. Lieberman, Joseph I. [ID-CT] 09/08/2009
Sen. Inouye, Daniel K. [D-HI] 09/10/2009
Sen. Merkley, Jeff [D-OR] 09/10/2009
Sen. Johanns, Mike [R-NE] 09/16/2009
Sen. Pryor, Mark L. [D-AR] 09/30/2009
Sen. Murray, Patty [D-WA] 01/21/2010
Sen. Lincoln, Blanche L. [D-AR] 01/26/2010
Sen. Lautenberg, Frank R. [D-NJ] 02/26/2010

Show cosponsors who withdrew