Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Sen. Alexander, Lamar [R-TN]* 03/25/2009
Sen. Sanders, Bernard [I-VT] 04/29/2009
Sen. Menendez, Robert [D-NJ] 05/05/2009
Sen. Whitehouse, Sheldon [D-RI] 05/12/2009
Sen. Gillibrand, Kirsten E. [D-NY] 05/19/2009
Sen. Feinstein, Dianne [D-CA] 07/13/2009
Sen. Durbin, Richard [D-IL] 08/06/2009
Sen. Klobuchar, Amy [D-MN] 12/08/2009
Sen. Lautenberg, Frank R. [D-NJ] 12/08/2009
Sen. Brown, Sherrod [D-OH] 04/12/2010
Sen. Mikulski, Barbara A. [D-MD] 06/21/2010