Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Sen. Alexander, Lamar [R-TN]* 03/25/2009
Sen. Wyden, Ron [D-OR]* 03/25/2009
Sen. Whitehouse, Sheldon [D-RI]* 03/25/2009
Sen. Brownback, Sam [R-KS]* 03/25/2009
Sen. Bayh, Evan [D-IN] 03/31/2009
Sen. Vitter, David [R-LA] 04/23/2009
Sen. Merkley, Jeff [D-OR] 04/27/2009
Sen. Roberts, Pat [R-KS] 04/30/2009
Sen. Reid, Harry [D-NV] 05/04/2009
Sen. Reed, Jack [D-RI] 05/05/2009
Sen. Burris, Roland [D-IL] 05/07/2009
Sen. Cardin, Benjamin L. [D-MD] 05/13/2010