Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Sen. Burr, Richard [R-NC]* 03/25/2009
Sen. Inouye, Daniel K. [D-HI] 03/02/2010
Sen. Ensign, John [R-NV] 03/04/2010
Sen. Hagan, Kay [D-NC] 03/11/2010
Sen. Lincoln, Blanche L. [D-AR] 03/17/2010
Sen. Crapo, Mike [R-ID] 04/14/2010
Sen. Tester, Jon [D-MT] 04/14/2010