Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Sen. Brown, Sherrod [D-OH] 04/21/2009
Sen. Johanns, Mike [R-NE] 05/11/2009
Sen. Hutchison, Kay Bailey [R-TX] 05/19/2009
Sen. Lambert, Blanche M. [D-AR] 05/19/2009
Sen. Kerry, John F. [D-MA] 06/01/2009
Sen. Johnson, Tim [D-SD] 06/02/2009
Sen. Mikulski, Barbara A. [D-MD] 06/09/2009
Sen. Tester, Jon [D-MT] 06/11/2009
Sen. Cardin, Benjamin L. [D-MD] 06/18/2009
Sen. Landrieu, Mary L. [D-LA] 06/18/2009
Sen. McCaskill, Claire [D-MO] 06/24/2009
Sen. Snowe, Olympia J. [R-ME] 06/24/2009
Sen. Bennet, Michael F. [D-CO] 07/07/2009
Sen. Wyden, Ron [D-OR] 07/10/2009
Sen. Burris, Roland [D-IL] 07/15/2009
Sen. Begich, Mark [D-AK] 07/16/2009
Sen. Murkowski, Lisa [R-AK] 09/10/2009